OPERATION SUNSHINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We send shipping containers of donated goods to the destitute in Zimbabwe and other African countries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 15 April 2009: Standard registration
- 03 January 2024: Funds received from 269514 ASSOCIATION OF PAST MEMBERS, ALL SAINTS, TOTTENHAM...
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zina Pepper | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Maria Callander | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hathaway | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|||||
John David Bradford | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Iain James Callander | Trustee | 28 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
Rev GARETH WEBBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.86k | £4.36k | £4.00k | £6.20k | £5.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.41k | £39.33k | £39.33k | £53.44k | £53.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 05 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF ZIMBABWE AND SUCH OTHER COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES IN AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE AS THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION CHOOSE, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, AND OTHER AID.
Area of benefit
ZIMBABWE AND SUCH OTHER COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES IN AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenlands
Canterbury Road
Lyminge
Folkestone
CT18 8HD
- Phone:
- 01303862799
- Email:
- opsunshine2016@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window