ST JAMES ROAD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of public religious worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

23 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southampton City
Governance
- 02 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- SJR (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Edward Robinson | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Kapend | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN KATHRYN BAILEY | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Pearce | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Tout | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rachel Dennison | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Hill | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Quansah | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL IRISH | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Penelope Jane Thorne | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Cookson | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Gilbert | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hamilton | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Craggs | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
HUGH EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Maureen Elizabeth Syed | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Gareth Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Hack | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
RUSSELL Joshua HACK | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
NEIL ROGER HITCH | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
JULIE MARGARET HERNIMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £725.82k | £184.55k | £224.01k | £260.02k | £301.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.33k | £508.85k | £184.66k | £218.56k | £245.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £658.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £13.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £27.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £22.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £182.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £600 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JAMES ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
ST. JAMES ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 5HE
- Phone:
- 02380661128
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window