BIRSTALL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF REGULAR PUBLIC ACTS OF WORSHIP OPEN TO MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND NON-MEMBERS ALIKE; THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS, COURSES AND SMALL GROUPS; PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND BEREAVED; PROVISION OF CHILDREN'S AND YOUNG PEOPLE'S ACTIVITIES; SUPPORTING THE WORK OF INTERNAL ORGANISATIONS OF THE CHURCH; PROMOTING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH THROUGH ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £2,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 02 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- BMC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kim Leslie Alexander | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
MAXILYN GEARY | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Julie Bamford | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Andrew Stuart Farrington | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Julie Tinley | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Biggins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Graham Tennant | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Ruth King | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Tinley | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER BRICE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
ANDREW WEBSTER | Trustee | 05 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MARION ELIZABETH LIQUORISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOAN PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DOROTHY CAROLE BOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS CHRIS TILFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JANE BRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Susan Wheeler | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Mary Downs | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.16k | £70.55k | £59.60k | £67.21k | £87.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.57k | £72.01k | £63.18k | £75.15k | £106.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.72k | £511 | £2.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birstall Methodist Church
Wanlip Lane
Birstall
LEICESTER
LE4 4JS
- Phone:
- 01163321261
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window