WELLINGTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

a) The provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members alike. b) The provision of sacred space (a building) for prayer and contemplation. c) The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. d) Pastorial work including visiting the sick and bereaved.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £102,584
Total expenditure: £96,525

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Telford & Wrekin

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Roger Dunlop Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
JENNIFER ALYS DIBB Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Margaret Whitehead Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Marjorie Christine Brown Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Joan James Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Roger Bengry Jones Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Susan Broughton MBE Trustee 14 June 2020
None on record
Gail Lilian Hocking Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Joseph Dewi Evans Trustee 01 September 2019
BELMONT COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
Carol Ann Hughes Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Ganga Nitta Trustee 11 June 2018
None on record
ELMIEN VAN RENSBURG Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
BARBARA LILLIAN MURRAY Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
ALISTAIR BATTRICK Trustee 12 May 2014
TELFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Diane Elizabeth Parkin Trustee 04 October 2013
TELFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Marlene Parton Trustee 26 February 2008
None on record
Eunice Rosemary Wedge Trustee 26 February 2008
None on record
TRACEY ANNE BAILEY CERT ED Trustee
None on record
CATHERINE STONES Trustee
None on record
TINA PRICE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £121.77k £99.31k £73.83k £93.72k £102.58k
Total expenditure £142.25k £82.13k £70.61k £91.47k £96.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2021 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 March 2021 274 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
New St
Wellington
TELFORD
TF1 1LU
Phone:
01952250994