THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE GREAT CROSBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities Provides facilities buildings open space for community use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 20 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S PCC GREAT CROSBY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Amanda Jane Bruce | Chair | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barry David Fell | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Turner | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Matthews | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Sothmann | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Alice Parsons | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Scaife | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anna Wilton | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Dent | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Turner-Bone | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Newsham | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan Neil Thompson | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Curwen | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jane Heaps | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Deninson | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Turner | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lily Jacqueline Parry | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin James Gill | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Agnes McKenna Law | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Debbie Burke | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Madeleine Ramsey | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Cawdron | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ZORINA ANNETTE JONES BA MA | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Colin Vincent Stephens | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.52k | £219.67k | £182.58k | £209.13k | £224.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.80k | £244.23k | £189.78k | £201.72k | £217.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.18k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 January 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 January 2023 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
71 Liverpool Road
Crosby
LIVERPOOL
L23 5SE
- Phone:
- 01519313119
- Email:
- office@stlukecrosby.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window