BRAMHALL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church operates from the heart of Bramhall, a suburb of Stockport, offering a wide range of activities in pursuit of its objectives. These activities fall into the following broad headings: * Worship and Prayer * Exploring Christianity * Supporting Life's Journey * World and Neighbourhood * Fellowship and Friendship * Involvement in our local community * Children and young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £148,109 from 1 government contract(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockport
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- BMC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Parkin | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Day | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Lomax | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hill | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Armstrong | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Thornley | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna-Louise Power MBChB | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Martin Low | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Clowes | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Castledine | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Ormiston | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hall BEd | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP SANDFORD | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Lee | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Winifred Lumb BSc Hons | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES THORNLEY | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BENVIE FCII, ACIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JUNE LINDA NIGHTINGALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £539.04k | £479.82k | £453.00k | £497.79k | £498.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £530.15k | £565.38k | £471.53k | £489.78k | £492.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £137.09k | £130.82k | N/A | £135.38k | £148.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.26k | £160.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £183.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £355.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £478 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £530.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £25.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THORN ROAD
BRAMHALL
STOCKPORT
SK7 1HQ
- Phone:
- 01614408007
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window