SKIPTON AND GRASSINGTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support to local Methodist Churches within the boundaries of the Circuit by providing ministers, religious services and administrative support. Promotes the Gospel of Christ to the local communities in which these churches are based. Provides organizational support for fundraising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TIMOTHY MARK PERKINS | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
EDWIN JOHN TATE | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan McIvor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Martin Bendall | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Millard | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Maria Essler | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Sylvia Bray | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Platt | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Dawn Platt | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Hearnes | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Stow | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Metcalf | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Charlton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Ethel Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Lloyd | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|||||
David Brian Stow | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roger Alan Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BEDFORD | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER BEDFORD BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.30k | £119.84k | £433.54k | £219.06k | £125.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.86k | £148.93k | £160.46k | £222.96k | £200.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Office
St. Andrews Hall
Newmarket Street
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 2JE
- Phone:
- 01756796584
- Website:
-
skiptongrassingtonmethodist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window