THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY SPRING GROVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship for all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick & the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses,small groups, events, meetings & the distribution of literature. Promoting the whole mission of the church through the provision of activities for senior citizens,parents, children & youth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £15,235 from 2 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S OSTERLEY PCC OR ST MARY'S SPRING GROVE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elis Matthews | Chair | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rafferty Milo Collis | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Green | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fiona Jane Budden | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Marie Matthews | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tania Kumaresan-Andoh | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Nortey | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Collis | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Jo Quartley | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE BELLIS | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Martin-Brown | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KERRISON BELLIS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Toye | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LILIAN MARY CAVE | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CARL BRYCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA JOYCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CAROLINE GREEN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.66k | £210.74k | £168.61k | £156.24k | £192.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.08k | £169.78k | £144.38k | £177.99k | £183.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Parish Centre
Osterley Road
Isleworth
TW7 4PW
- Phone:
- 02085697312
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window