THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHIGWELL AND CHIGWELL ROW

Charity number: 1133035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides buildings for regular public worship open to everyone. Members of the charity are engaged in visiting the sick and bereaved. The whole mission of the Christian church is promoted through the provision of activities for senior citizens, local young people, parents and toddlers and other special needs groups and through the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £396,611
Total expenditure: £374,510

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Redbridge

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHIGWELL AND CHIGWELL ROW PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev CHARLES ANTONI KOSLA Chair 25 April 2021
None on record
WILLIAM GORDON WORTH Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
Joy Alison Madeiros Trustee 28 May 2023
OASIS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
RICHARD COATES Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
PATRICIA ROSALIND JOHNSON Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Rev ANN LOUISE KOSLA Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
DANIEL STEVEN FORSHAW Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
KIM SAMANTHA OSBOURNE Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
PAUL STEPHEN PRESTON Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Rev LORRAINE ANN SMART Trustee 25 April 2021
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Recently registered
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
GEORGE AND ALFRED LEWIS (OF CHIGWELL) MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
JOAN SIMPSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ADEBAYO ADEKUNJO Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Helen Marjorie Ellis-Poole Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
BRENDA MAUREEN TARMAN Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
SHIRLEY AUSTRIDGE Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Rev Paula Ann Preston Trustee 09 May 2016
None on record
JANICE ELIZABETH RANDALL Trustee 17 April 2016
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Recently registered
JOAN SIMPSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GEORGE AND ALFRED LEWIS (OF CHIGWELL) MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHARD MICHAEL KINDER Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Gillian Darke Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
SANDIE MAY FORSHAW Trustee 27 April 2014
CHELMSFORD CURSILLO
Received: On time
WILLIAM DARKE Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record
CYNTHIA ELIZABETH BARBER Trustee
None on record
ALISON SHEILA JORDAN Trustee
JOAN SIMPSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GEORGE AND ALFRED LEWIS (OF CHIGWELL) MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Recently registered
JOHN EDWIN BARBER Trustee
GEORGE AND ALFRED LEWIS (OF CHIGWELL) MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOAN SIMPSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £454.13k £353.35k £385.57k £414.44k £396.61k
Total expenditure £418.62k £352.63k £465.82k £424.99k £374.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 January 2024 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 January 2024 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 December 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 December 2021 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
All Saints House
Romford Road
Chigwell
IG7 4QD
Phone:
02085000914
Website:

allsaintschigwellrow.org.uk