SHEFFIELD (BRUNSWICK) METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING THE ACTIVITIES OF THE 8 METHODIST CHURCHES AND 2 LEP's IN THE SHEFFIELD (BRUNSWICK) CIRCUIT BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT THROUGH PROVIDING MINISTERS, TRAINING AND RESOURCES. THE SHEFFIELD (BRUNSWICK) CIRCUIT OPERATES IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERING PART OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND PART OF NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 14 August 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 August 2014: Funds transferred to 1134151 SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.46k | £358.14k | £210.13k | £217.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.78k | £330.33k | £282.71k | £328.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 19 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 19 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 25 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 25 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 12 July 2012 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 12 July 2012 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 24 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 24 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window