THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUKINFIELD ST JOHN

Charity Number: 1134598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all; provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved; teaching of Christianity; taking of religious assemblies in schools; promotion of the whole mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other groups; supporting other charities in the UK and overseas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £151,054
Total expenditure: £166,869

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST JOHN'S PCC, DUKINFIELD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Hayes Chair
None on record
Vanessa Zanft Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Denise Michele Connolly Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Catherine Patricia Burgess Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Isaac Grant Morrison Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Broadbent Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
John Gerard Leigh Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Jane Louise Metcalfe Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Helena Marie Hill Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Karen Dewsnap Clarke Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Andrew Knight Trustee 18 November 2021
None on record
Erica Splawnyk Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Valerie Devlin Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
OSYP SPLAWNYK Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
PETE DEVLIN Trustee 19 April 2015
TAMESIDE EAST FOODBANK
Received: On time
Ben Hayes Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
LUCY MARY LEECH Trustee 14 July 2013
None on record
IAN LEECH Trustee 14 April 2011
None on record
PATRICIA MARGARET BRADSHAW Trustee
None on record
WENDY CLIFFORD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £152.85k £137.73k £155.29k £151.78k £151.05k
Total expenditure £155.50k £142.05k £123.16k £170.76k £166.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Johns Church
Vicarage Drive
DUKINFIELD
SK16 5HZ
Phone:
01613388199
Website:

stjohnsdukinfield.com