BACK 2 BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment by promoting waste reduction by the provision of refurbishment, repair and recycling services for donated bicycles and donated items. Also the relief of unemployment including the provision of opportunities in the refurbishment of bicycles through practical work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Creek | Chair | 08 April 2010 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN HUNT | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ian Allred | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.67k | £47.80k | £59.85k | £51.21k | £51.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.86k | £38.04k | £39.97k | £47.39k | £43.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.88k | £3.29k | £7.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING WASTE REDUCTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF REFURBISHMENT, REPAIR AND RECYCLING SERVICES FOR DONATED BICYCLES AND DONATED ITEMS. (2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES IN THE REFURBISHMENT OF BICYCLES THROUGH PRACTICAL WORK. (3) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 4
GREYFRIARS BUSINESS PARK
GREYFRIARS WAY
STAFFORD
ST16 2RF
- Phone:
- 01785257483
- Email:
- office@back2bikes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window