BASO-THE ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association is a membership association for members of the medical profession working with patients with cancer. It corresponds with its membership regularly to give them updates and information. It also runs a Scientific Conference annually, which features guest lectures, symposia and submitted abstracts. A more extensive programme of meetings is being developed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Ibrahim Sallam | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ms Gloria Petralia | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anastasios Kanatas | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pankaj Roy Gupta | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Tomlins | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Cunha | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Skaife | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Avi Agrawal | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anant Desai | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Aaron Quyn | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jayant Vaidya | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jim Khan | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor MICHAEL DOUEK FRCS | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.45k | £138.74k | £133.08k | £120.30k | £218.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.45k | £79.57k | £111.14k | £146.43k | £221.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 APRIL 2010 as amended on 17 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE, PRACTICE AND ART OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS WITH CANCER, AND 2 TO ADVANCE RESEARCH, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN SURGICAL ONCOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF TH0AT RESEARCH SERVICES AND BY FACILITATING PARTNERSHIP AND THE COOPERATION IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR B THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 'VOLUNTARY SECTOR' MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS A CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES B VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal College Of Surgeons Of Englan
38-43 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02078696854
- Email:
- admin@baso.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window