WILDGOOSE RURAL TRAINING

Charity number: 1142201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing training, education and therapeutic opportunities in land based subjects via activities and courses designed for adults with disablities and young people who find the challenges of schooling difficult. We aim to reconnect people to the land and their food.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 2011: Standard registration
  • 21 March 2024: Funds received from 1096063 THURSDAY ACTIVITIES CLUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TOP BARN TRAINING CENTRE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynn Cartwright Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Brian Boswell Trustee 01 May 2023
THE OAKVILLE SINGERS
Received: On time
HALLOW UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Helen Montgomery Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Geoffrey Sansome Trustee 19 October 2021
CHAPLAINCY FOR AGRICULTURE AND RURAL LIFE
Received: On time
THE OXFORD FARMING CONFERENCE
Received: On time
Moira Terrett Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
DAVID FRANK SAUNDERS Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Stuart Charles Brown Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £399.25k £391.97k £493.68k £696.10k £885.36k
Total expenditure £395.87k £339.98k £440.53k £653.82k £850.05k
Income from government contracts £269.27k £289.85k £433.92k £621.32k £698.49k
Income from government grants £10.00k £69.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £70.82k £185.04k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £624.36k £699.25k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £684 £1.07k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £243 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £469.28k £569.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £8.01k £37.84k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £4.03k £5.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £176.53k £242.90k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £384.31k £402.26k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £1 £1
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £274.35k £255.08k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £445.24k £408.61k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wildgoose Rural Training & Nature
Main Road
Hallow
WORCESTER
WR2 6LS
Phone:
01905 620840