TRINITY CHURCH MILL HILL (UNITED REFORMED AND METHODIST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The celebration of Christian worship; The teaching of the Christian faith; Mission and evangelism; Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; The provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the youngs and other groups with special needs; The support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 February 2011: Standard registration
- TRINITY CHURCH MILL HILL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angelina Twum Barima | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marion Taylor | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
GENEVIEVE TETTEY | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Priddy | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ishbel Lewis | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID NEWTON | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ZOE DJIN | Trustee | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NINA LOMOKIE MANIESON | Trustee | 25 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR RICHARD JOHN BINGLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAULINE JANE SEATON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MIKE PETERSEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MALCOLM GILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.21k | £107.06k | £149.86k | £165.30k | £156.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.55k | £180.97k | £147.28k | £184.60k | £178.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Fairfolds
WATFORD
WD25 9UN
- Phone:
- 01923662364
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window