THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD SHOREDITCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish Church of St Leonard Shoreditch in the London Borough of Hackney
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Islington
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 05 January 2011: Standard registration
- SHOREDITCH CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Driver | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Devon Kuziw | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jess Cliff | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anna Holton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Toby Thomas | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Matthews | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Parmiter | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Mark Nelson | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Yvonne Tapper | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Naomi Maxwell | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Alexander Gordon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
DEBORAH MARY PRITCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PHILIP MICHAEL WHITEHEAD MA MSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £377.85k | £200.04k | £268.45k | £287.62k | £379.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403.99k | £181.34k | £331.62k | £349.99k | £368.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2024 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
EXCEPTED 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shoreditch Church
Shoreditch High Street
LONDON
E1 6JN
- Phone:
- 07989565739
- Email:
- mark@saint.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window