THE MASTER AND SCHOLARS OF BALLIOL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In pursuit of our charitable objects to advance education, religion, learning and research within the context of the University of Oxford, we admit, teach, and mentor undergraduate and graduate students on a wide variety of degree courses, facilitate research and scholarship within the academic membership of the College, and cater for an international community of learning, and maintain a chapel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£22,307,000
Donations and legacies | £7.57m | |
Charitable activities | £8.20m | |
Other trading activities | £2.61m | |
Investments | £3.01m | |
Other | £926.00k |
Total expenditure:
£18,671,000
Raising funds | £719.00k | |
Charitable activities | £16.15m | |
Other | £1.80m |
-£4,197,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.52m | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.15m | |
Retained for future use | £3.64m |
People

156 Employee(s)
49 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- BALLIOL COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
49 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME Helen Frances GHOSH | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||
AMANDA TILLEY | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Matthew Langton | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr James Kwan | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Katrina Davis | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Alexander Bown | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR JASON LOTAY | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ELIZABETH KISS | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Sir Hugh Charles Jonathan Godfray | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
HELEN GITTOS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Alexander Kaiserman | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr MIGUEL BALLESTER | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ADAM EDWARD PHILIP CAULTON | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR PHILIP HOWARD | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD NORMAN | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor RICHARD OVENDEN OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR ADAM SMYTH | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Dr CORALIA CARTIS | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr DANIEL BUTT | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr DEREK MOULTON | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR ELENA LOMBARDI | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JIN-CHONG TAN | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DR MATTHEW ROBINSON MA DPHIL | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR ROBIN CHOUDHURY | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JOHN-PAUL GHOBRIAL | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR MANUELA ZACCOLO | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr LISA JANE WALKER | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR Thomas Frederick Melham | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr NICOLA ZOE TROTT | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR SANDRA PAOLI MA PHD | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JAMES FORDER MA DPHIL | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR ANDRE LUKAS | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR DERMOT MICHAEL O'HARE MA DPHIL | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR ROSALIND THOMAS BA MA PHD | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR DAVID M LUCAS MA DPHIL | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr MARTIN HERBERT CONWAY | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR THOMAS H NOE | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR SEBASTIAN MORDECAI SHIMELD BSC MA PHD | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR FREDDIE CHARLES HAMDY | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr GRANT IAN LAMOND | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ARMIN JOSEF HERMANN REICHOLD | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR WILLIAM BARFORD BSC MA PHD | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr SUDHIR KUMAR HAZAREESINGH | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR SOPHIE MARNETTE MA PHD | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ADRIAN KELLY | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr SIMON ANDREW SKINNER | Trustee | 29 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Andrew Hurrell | Trustee | 29 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DR DOMINIC CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN MA PHD | Trustee | 29 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr SEAMUS PERRY | Trustee | 01 January 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.09m | £10.38m | £11.76m | £14.25m | £17.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.66m | £14.45m | £14.30m | £18.09m | £18.67m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £450.00k | £694.00k | £68.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.56m | £2.79m | £2.97m | £2.69m | £7.57m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.72m | £770.00k | £412.00k | £1.45m | £2.61m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.21m | £5.74m | £5.99m | £7.68m | £8.20m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £2.37m | £1.91m | £1.01m | £754.00k | £5.03m | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.63m | £2.34m | £2.45m | £2.79m | £3.01m | |
|
Income - Other | £350.00k | £652.00k | £951.00k | £397.00k | £926.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £6.28m | £0 | £115.90k | £10.00k | £35.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.85m | £12.64m | £12.70m | £16.08m | £16.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £488.00k | £454.00k | £460.00k | £600.00k | £719.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.00k | £28.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £34.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.33m | £1.36m | £1.14m | £1.41m | £1.80m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £41.16m | £166.61m | £61.08m | £59.38m | £57.64m | |
|
Long-term investments | £139.18m | £12.34m | £135.43m | £140.06m | £144.21m | |
|
Other assets | £11.34m | £9.01m | £9.49m | £9.49m | £5.74m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.39m | -£2.10m | -£1.86m | -£2.82m | -£1.83m | |
|
Total liabilities | £37.58m | £38.32m | £37.71m | £37.93m | £38.13m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DERVORGUILLA'S STATUTES OF 1282, FOUNDATION DEED 1284 CHARTER 1599 THE 1923 OXFORD AND CAMBRIDGE ACT SUBSEQUENTLY AMENDED BY THE 1989 EDUCATION REFORM ACT, AND MOST LATTERLY AMENDED ACCORDING TO THE 1923 ACT AND APPROVED BY HER MAJESTY IN COUNCIL ON 10 DECEMBER 2003, 9 APRIL 2008, AND 11 MARCH 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIGION, LEARNING, AND RESEARCH; AND TO BE A COLLEGE WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BALLIOL COLLEGE
BROAD STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3BJ
- Phone:
- 01865277715
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window