Army Benevolent Fund

Charity number: 1146420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's Objectives are to benefit persons who are serving or who have served in the British Army, or their dependants, in any charitable way by the provision of grants, loans, gifts, pensions or otherwise.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 2012: Standard registration
  • 28 November 2013: Funds received from 1088617 THE SECOND (2001) KENYA REGIMENT TRUST
  • 16 March 2015: Funds received from 211645-1 THE GULF TRUST (ARMY AND CIVILIAN)
  • 16 March 2015: Funds received from 211645 ABF THE SOLDIERS' CHARITY
  • 15 April 2018: Funds received from 229631 THE COMMANDOS BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 03 August 2018: Funds received from 231652 THE FELLOWSHIP OF THE SERVICES HEART BENEATH FUND
  • 23 August 2022: Funds received from 274730 SELKIRK NO 2 TRUST
  • 05 May 2023: Funds received from 1166685 THE QUEEN'S LANCASHIRE REGIMENT VETERANS CHARITY.
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ABF THE SOLDIERS' CHARITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RACHEL SARAH BOOTH Chair 01 July 2020
None on record
Anna Katherine Lucy Sedgley Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Caitlin Murea Hayden Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Mark George Culmer Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Samuel Leslie Humphris Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Julie White Trustee 01 August 2023
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST WILFRID IN RIPON
Received: On time
THORPE PREBEND HOUSE
Received: On time
Christopher Glynn Sheridan Hughes Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Paul Carney Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
ROWENA RUTH FELL Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
DAVID CHARLES GEORGE LONDON Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Anthony Craufurd Scott Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
Amanda Metcalfe Trustee 29 November 2017
None on record
JAMES ROUS Trustee 01 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.78m £11.85m £11.16m £11.40m £15.26m
Total expenditure £18.11m £12.31m £13.39m £14.68m £15.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.69m £9.32m £8.01m £7.27m £10.03m
Income - Other trading activities £2.96m £951.61k £2.46m £3.41m £2.74m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £250.00k
Income - Investment £2.13m £1.38m £547.27k £724.42k £2.49m
Income - Other £0 £187.82k £139.44k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £3.69m £3.15m £3.20m £2.35m £5.24m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.18m £8.27m £8.43m £8.98m £9.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.93m £4.04m £4.96m £5.69m £6.47m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £742.31k £777.40k £852.26k £199.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £3.54m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £182.31k £123.60k £100.55k £63.04k £32.47k
Long-term investments £70.58m £82.77m £87.32m £82.42m £78.33m
Other assets £8.19m £14.29m £14.05m £11.59m £21.23m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.05m £3.29m £1.34m £1.21m £1.69m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MOUNTBARROW HOUSE
6-20 ELIZABETH STREET
LONDON
SW1W 9RB
Phone:
02079018900