TRANSFORMING CHURCHES AND COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TCC's main activities are: 1. Information Service: 2. Basic Service: 3. Consultancy Service: 4. Project Management:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 January 2013: Standard registration
- TCC (Working name)
- TRANSFORMING CHURCHES AND COMMUNITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Caroline Wickens | Chair | 29 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Peter Edward Powers | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stephanie Louise Roux | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sandra Macaulay Waddington | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Catherine Bird | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.54k | £116.40k | £131.13k | £112.53k | £125.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.42k | £109.40k | £129.51k | £110.65k | £129.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 09 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERED BY THE METHODIST CHURCH IN BRITAIN AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE ”AREA OF BENEFIT”) AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHERE: (A) "THIRD SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISE; (B) "CHARITIES" ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING METHODIST CHURCHES, OTHER CHRISTIAN DENOMINATIONS AND OTHER FAITH COMMUNITIES; AND (C) "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 2. TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wesley Centre
Royce Road
MANCHESTER
M15 5BP
- Phone:
- 07883339698
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window