FRIENDS OF HOLT HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run 3 'open gates' events days to raise money for the Bursary. We use the Bursary to enable less privileged young people to attend Holt Hall Residential Environmental and Outdoor Learning Centre, including day visits. We support vulnerable young people to access work experience opportunities at Holt Hall. We write bids to enable young people to develop employability skills (green economy).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 April 2013: Standard registration
- 16 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 16 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1128752 Holt Youth Project
- 16 November 2023: Funds transferred to 311119 WHITWELL HALL COUNTRY CENTRE LTD
- 16 November 2023: Funds transferred to 303986 HORSTEAD CENTRE
- 16 November 2023: Funds transferred to 289171 HOW HILL TRUST
- 16 November 2023: Funds transferred to 208734 NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.99k | £2.72k | £759 | £8.64k | £25 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.14k | £2.95k | £570 | £2.15k | £12.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/2013
Charitable objects
(1)TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN PARTICULAR THOSE USING HOLT HALL IN HOLT, NORFOLK BY: (A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING THEM DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B)ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION; (C)PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO VOLUNTEER TO FURTHER A CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES; AND (D)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS IN ALL INSTANCES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR THEIR BENEFIT INCLUDING PROVIDING THEM WITH ACCESS TO OUTDOOR FACILITIES THAT FOCUS ON BIODIVERSITY AND SUSTAINABILITY. (2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR USING HOLT HALL AS A EDUCATIONAL RESOURCE AND SUPPORTING PUBLIC ACCESS TO IT (IN SUCH WAYS THAT DO NOT RELIEVE THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OF ITS STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS). (3)TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AT HOLT HALL AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT (PROVIDING IN DOING SO THE TRUSTEES DO NOT RELIEVE ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR GOVERNMENT OF THEIR STATUTORY RESPONSIBILITIES).
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window