LIVING WELL BROMLEY

Charity number: 1157385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a foodbank and support charity based in Penge, South East London. Our mission is to ensure that people have food, guidance and support of an uplifting community to live life to the fullest. Our services are free to use and include a foodbank, clothes bank, hot meals, free cafe, community choir, counselling and help with benefits,debt and housing issues.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £421,036
Total expenditure: £374,684

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 June 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew John Cornish Chair 17 March 2022
None on record
Ryan David Thomson Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Alan James Mason Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Robert Short Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Jessica Claire Smith Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Arthur William Skinner Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Noel Hanrahan Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Dr Roger Augustus Wells Trustee 16 July 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S BECKENHAM
Received: On time
Anthony Godfrey Adams Trustee 23 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £90.74k £309.87k £204.24k £407.35k £421.04k
Total expenditure £69.59k £172.16k £248.08k £255.89k £374.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH
66 LENNARD ROAD
LONDON
SE20 7LX
Phone:
02086598991