HAMLIN FISTULA UK

Charity Number: 1153053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support the Addis Ababa Fistula Hospital in Ethiopia, together with its outreach centres and the Hamlin Midwifery College.In particular we fund the running costs of the Yirgalem outreach centre. We contribute to the cost of medical and other requirements ordered directly by the hospital staff.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley
  • Ethiopia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Greg Morris Chair 15 July 2016
None on record
Marchu Belete Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Hewete Haileselassie Trustee 15 July 2022
Action Against Hunger UK
Received: On time
Lisbeth Gail Grundy MBE Trustee 31 July 2020
None on record
Alison Louise Murray Trustee 16 June 2019
None on record
Sarah Louise Hewitt-Clarkson Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £630.81k £416.48k £412.28k £782.43k £558.77k
Total expenditure £432.69k £582.47k £754.97k £1.19m £1.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £499.18k N/A N/A £575.19k £325.35k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £428 N/A N/A £106.41k £177.12k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £131.20k N/A N/A £100.83k £56.31k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £56.39k N/A N/A £286.11k £41.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £398.11k N/A N/A £1.01m £885.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.57k N/A N/A £171.19k £202.20k
Expenditure - Governance £4.66k N/A N/A £4.29k £16.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £693.59k £622.65k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £11.06k £8.79k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Long-term investments £2.54m N/A N/A £1.51m £1.33m
Other assets £87.35k N/A N/A £353.50k £78.41k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £7.54k N/A N/A £6.03k £11.73k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 5 DECEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 8 DECEMBER 1996, 11 JULY 2007 AND 22 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
1) THE SUPPORT EXTENSION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PLASTIC SURGICAL OR OTHER TREATMENT OF CHILDBIRTH INJURIES IN ETHIOPIA AND CONVALESCENCE AND REHABILITATION OF PATIENTS AFTER TREATMENT AND THE PREVENTION OF SUCH INJURIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED). 2) FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
FOREIGN
Registration history
  • 11 March 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Hamlin Fistula UK
TouchBase Pears
750 Bristol Road
Birmingham
West Midlands
B29 6NA
Phone:
01215593999