ASB HELP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim and objective of the Charity is to facilitate the good administration of the law by providing advice and support to victims of anti-social behaviour and encouraging the greater efficiency of local authorities and the police in responding to reports of anti-social behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2013: CIO registration
- ASBHELP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN RICHER | Chair | 09 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Gareth Sands | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Adrian Tonge | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jennifer Elaine Herrera | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Victoria Louise Heap | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Damien Desmond Morrison | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
JULIE ABRAHAM | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £115.10k | £260.23k | £143.10k | £161.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.58k | £109.36k | £189.27k | £180.48k | £193.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
TO FACILITATE THE GOOD ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO VICTIMS OF ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR AND ENCOURAGING THE GREATER EFFICIENCY OF LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND THE POLICE IN RESPONDING TO REPORTS OF ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASB Help
3-4 Hankey Place
London
SE1 4BB
- Phone:
- 02035030797
- Email:
- admin@asbhelp.co.uk
- Website:
-
asbhelp.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window