DALE STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1153330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing regular acts of Christian worship open to all; providing space for prayer/ contemplation; supporting groups for bible study and fellowship; providing activities with a Christian ethos for the young, their carers, and the elderly; promoting the mission of the church; demonstrating care for the community through social projects and donations; providing space for community activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £152,483
Total expenditure: £106,866

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 2013: Previously excepted registration
  • 06 December 2022: Funds received from 1007428 AGE CONCERN LEAMINGTON SPA
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Tina Jane Brooker Chair 01 September 2023
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
David Keverne Sandy Trustee 19 May 2024
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Derek John Dwyer Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Paul Avijit Mondal Trustee 26 September 2023
None on record
TREVOR JOHN PETHICK Trustee 01 September 2023
BIRMINGHAM DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Iain Mark Ballard Trustee 01 September 2023
KENILWORTH METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Margaret Ann Begg Trustee 21 May 2023
THE LEAMINGTON SOCIETY
Received: On time
Jane Edwina McConville Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
JUNE GABBITAS Trustee 13 June 2021
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
GRAHAM CHARLES HOWE Trustee 22 May 2018
None on record
MARGARET ELIZABETH FERRER Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
TONY PARKINSON Trustee 02 June 2017
None on record
MRS PENNY SHARPLES Trustee 14 May 2017
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MARK EDWARD WHITEHOUSE Trustee 27 September 2016
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ANDREW TIMOTHY EMM Trustee 08 August 2013
WELCOME HERE LEAMINGTON AND WARWICK
Recently registered
LEAMINGTON SPA STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Margaret Christine Weir Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
MAUREEN DARBY Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
ELISABETH MARY FREEMAN Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
MRS JO PARKINSON Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
JOANNA CHRISTINE RHODES Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record
MARK PREEDY Trustee 08 August 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £132.54k £101.92k £61.46k £94.74k £152.48k
Total expenditure £148.77k £131.56k £111.69k £120.43k £106.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dale Street Methodist Church
Dale Street
Leamington Spa
CV32 5HL
Phone:
07479 556913