LONDON BASEBALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Greater London by the provision of facilities and education for playing baseball and softball.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Galvin | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thompson | Trustee | 12 July 2015 |
|
|||||
E Stanton McLean | Trustee | 12 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.72k | £20.89k | £74.11k | £65.97k | £90.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.69k | £52.35k | £55.13k | £39.96k | £92.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 February 2025 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 February 2025 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 January 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 10 January 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF GREATER LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EDUCATION FOR PLAYING BASEBALL AND SOFTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
165A Percy Road
LONDON
W12 9QJ
- Phone:
- 07764969273
- Email:
- Trustees@londonsports.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window