SWAFFHAM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1163777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £53,480
Total expenditure: £56,463

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 September 2015: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Anne Horton Chair 01 September 2019
None on record
Jennifer Woodfin Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Jennifer Mary Tasker Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
Grant Preston Kennedy Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
JANET MAUREEN HILLS Trustee 02 July 2017
None on record
RAYMOND STUART CUNNINGHAM Trustee 02 July 2017
None on record
JOHN BARRIE THORP Trustee 16 February 2015
None on record
ANNE CHRISTINE THORP Trustee 16 February 2015
None on record
MURIEL OLIVE BEAN Trustee 16 February 2015
None on record
JO TRICK Trustee 16 February 2015
CENTRAL NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Rodgers BA, FRSA Trustee 16 February 2015
PRS MEMBERS' FUND
Received: On time
Geraldine Mary Allen LRAM, ARCM Trustee 16 February 2015
CENTRAL NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SANDRA JANE SIMM BA, PGCE Trustee 16 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £240.39k £32.65k £28.17k £36.44k £53.48k
Total expenditure £322.75k £55.37k £39.03k £35.49k £56.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.29k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Church Lane
Holme Hale
THETFORD
Norfolk
IP25 7DS
Phone:
01760 441441