MANOR CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Prevention of social exclusion: - Activities for children with parents - After school provision for children - Activities for young people - Contact isolated older people - Improving the environment - Providing support to local residents b) Provision of facilities for recreation and leisure time activities: - Organising community events - Developing a multi-purpose community facility
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 02 October 2015: CIO registration
- MCCP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Debora Karen Marschner | Chair | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Richards | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Annabel Terry | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Dand | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Heather Irene Rotherham | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Derek William Newman | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Claire Fiona Curtice Dalpra | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.77k | £218.40k | £20.10k | £26.44k | £66.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.71k | £218.10k | £13.19k | £17.50k | £54.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Oct 2015 as amended on 04 May 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: a) To promote social inclusion for the public benefit of Sheffield Manor residents by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society. (For the purpose of this clause “socially excluded” means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of being a member of the socially and economically deprived community of Sheffield Manor and surrounding areas and/or as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); disability; substance abuse or dependency including alcohol or drugs; discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender re-assignment; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing (i.e. that does not meet basic habitable standards); crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society).) b) For the benefit of the inhabitants of Sheffield Manor and the surrounding areas, to provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life. c) To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of Sheffield Manor residents in accordance with: the provision of sacred spaces and worship services; the provision of public rituals and ceremonies; contributing to the spiritual and moral education of children; contributing towards a better society for example by promoting social cohesion and social capital; carrying out, as a practical expression of religious beliefs, other activities (such as advancing education or conflict resolution, or relieving poverty), which may also be charitable.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Aidans Church
2 Manor Lane
SHEFFIELD
S2 1UF
- Phone:
- 07841727121
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window