THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL GOODMAYES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Pauls Church Goodmayes operates in the Redbridge Deanery in the Chelmsford Diocese. The Parochial Church Council is responsible for co-operating with the Vicar, Reverend Janet Buchan, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church: pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It is also responsible for the maintenance of the Church building and Community Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 02 July 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAUL`S CHURCH GOODMAYES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JANET ELIZABETH FORBES BUCHAN B.A | Chair | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Halls | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ramasamy | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Samuels | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gweneth Afariwah Nneji | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nkemdilim Ifeoma Williams | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John George Hill M.A | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
VAL THOMPSON | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE ASEA | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDY HALLS | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HILL | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kim Bownas | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Len Tulloch | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Princess Onyeukwu | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £241.58k | £83.47k | £104.64k | £121.90k | £122.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.01k | £123.01k | £175.46k | £138.76k | £152.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 EASTWOOD ROAD
ILFORD
IG3 8XA
- Phone:
- 02085906596
- Email:
- revjanetbuchan@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window