GILLINGHAM SALEM CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity Number: 1165354
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sunday services for Christian worship, communion, prayer, Bible teaching including weddings, funerals etc.. Mid week Christian Bible study groups and missionary meeting To help serve the local community in Medway providing clubs for people to meet local need including renting rooms. Partner with Medway Foodbank, giving out food vouchers to people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018

Total income: £25,270
Total expenditure: £23,646

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 2016: CIO registration
  • 06 November 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 06 November 2023: Funds transferred to 214779 THE SALVATION ARMY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £15.93k £20.00k £25.27k
Total expenditure £15.60k £24.55k £23.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted