THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST DAVID, FLEETWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 August 2016: Standard registration
- ST PETER'S AND ST DAVID'S PCC, FLEETWOOD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Downes | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan McLean | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Rose Ashton | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Stead | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Swarbrick | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Di Graveston | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HILARY CRAIG optional | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EASTWOOD optional | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.62k | £95.26k | £121.58k | £125.20k | £170.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.54k | £94.64k | £98.55k | £98.96k | £98.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2024 | 822 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Mount Road
FLEETWOOD
FY7 6QZ
- Phone:
- 07383 281375
- Email:
- andrew@fleetwood.church
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window