THE WELCOME DIRECTORY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the rehabilitation of ex-offenders for the public benefit by working with people from a range of faith communities in the United Kingdom to develop and maintain an infrastructure which supports those leaving prison so that such people are integrated into society to lead law-abiding lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £40,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Robert Smyth | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ajmer Singh | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pastor Modupe Adefala | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rizwana Reza | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Fred Ireland | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Shaffiq Din | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Holloway | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ERIC SOUTHWICK | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rev Robert Wilson | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £58.50k | £81.48k | £56.06k | £105.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.38k | £27.26k | £53.52k | £71.62k | £80.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.73k | £34.08k | £37.00k | £40.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE FROM A RANGE OF FAITH COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN AN INFRASTRUCTURE WHICH SUPPORTS THOSE LEAVING PRISON SO THAT SUCH PEOPLE ARE INTEGRATED INTO SOCIETY TO LEAD LAW-ABIDING LIVES, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. PROVIDING A NATIONAL DIRECTORY AS A RESOURCE FOR EX-OFFENDERS AND PRISON CHAPLAINS THAT LISTS COMMUNITIES FROM A RANGE OF FAITH BACKGROUNDS WHICH HAVE IDENTIFIED THEMSELVES AS BEING WELCOMING AND SUPPORTIVE OF PEOPLE LEAVING PRISON; 2. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF FAITH COMMUNITIES TO ENGAGE IN EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT WILL EQUIP THEM TO UNDERSTAND AND RESPOND APPROPRIATELY TO THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE LEAVING PRISON AND THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY AFTER RELEASE;
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 TAVISTOCK SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 9HH
- Phone:
- 02036518336
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window