THE BL MINYAN

Charity number: 1169519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,488
Total expenditure: £13,965

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARYEH YEHUDAH MELINEK Chair 06 October 2016
FRIENDS OF ORCHOS TORAH
Received: On time
GATESHEAD YESHIVA ALUMNI LIMITED
Received: On time
ATERES BEIS YAAKOV LIMITED
Received: On time
NAFSHAINU
Received: On time
NWLJ SCHOOLS PLANNING COMMITTEE
Received: On time
LEGADEL
Received: On time
HAVINENU
Recently registered
BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE CHAZON ISH INSTITUTIONS
Received: On time
VESHINANTOM
Recently registered
Daniel Starr Trustee 03 November 2022
None on record
Andrew Scher Trustee 03 November 2022
None on record
Oriel Soriano Trustee 03 November 2022
None on record
Rabbi YITSCHAK MENACHEM ELZAS Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
YECHIEL ZALMAN SONNENFELD Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.03k £8.64k £5.90k £22.21k £5.49k
Total expenditure £19.42k £8.37k £10.36k £9.54k £13.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 19 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 15 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
First Floor Winston House
349 Regents Park Road
N3 1DH
Phone:
02034112001
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available