COMBINED CADET FORCE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1170994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To: act as an adviser to the MoD and HMG on CCF matters; act as a source of information and advice for Contingent Commanders and CCF Officers; promote the CCF; provide financial grants to CCF cadets to assist their development; and, provide financial grants to CCF Contingents in order to help them establish or become more sustainable.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Cadets in Schools (Working name)
  • CCFA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel David Alan Maddox CBE Chair 12 December 2016
None on record
Stephen Robinson Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Simon Blackmore Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Christopher Roberts Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Ian Cohen Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Caroline Jane Hutton-Stott Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Bonell OBE Trustee 08 September 2022
LEWES OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Alexander Edward Hudson Trustee 07 December 2019
None on record
Simon John McMenemy VR Trustee 11 December 2017
INNS OF COURT AND CITY YEOMANRY TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Zain Hamid Trustee 12 December 2016
None on record
Jonathan James Bleakley Trustee 12 December 2016
None on record
Julia Yu Wan Hodgson Trustee 12 December 2016
None on record
Michael Hampshire Trustee 04 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.22m £232.80k £2.16m £1.36m £1.69m
Total expenditure £611.39k £1.66m £533.36k £2.27m £1.78m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.14m £182.87k £2.10m £1.16m £1.55m
Income - Donations and legacies £498.40k N/A £2.11m £1.18m £1.57m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.69m N/A £21.91k £133.60k £56.16k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.28k N/A £13.30k £32.99k £59.99k
Income - Other £9.68k N/A £9.39k £12.22k £6.96k
Income - Legacies £30 N/A £684 £0 £131
Expenditure - Charitable activities £610.79k N/A £532.76k £2.27m £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £600 N/A £600 £600 £3.90k
Expenditure - Governance £9.25k N/A £10.20k £22.39k £20.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £238.72k N/A £35.47k £1.43m £783.74k
Expenditure - Investment management £600 N/A £600 £600 £3.90k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 N/A £0 £0 £30.99k
Long-term investments £595.30k N/A £703.81k £683.55k £789.65k
Other assets £3.68m N/A £3.89m £2.94m £3.29m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £47.44k N/A £79.05k £66.53k £503.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 11 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COMBINED CADET FORCE ASSOCIATION
HOLDERNESS HOUSE
51-61 CLIFTON STREET
LONDON
EC2A 4DW
Phone:
020 4586 8181
Website:

combinedcadetforce.org.uk/ccfa