CARE OF POLICE SURVIVORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides peer support to the families of police officers and police staff who have lost their lives while on duty. This support can be of a one to one nature or group activities such as parents weekends, spouses weekends and children's activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£734,294
Donations and legacies | £652.63k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £78.89k | |
Investments | £2.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£775,351
Raising funds | £132.33k | |
Charitable activities | £643.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £132.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £643.02k |
People

9 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 December 2016: CIO registration
- COPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Robins | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Everitt | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Jane Cox | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Gurr | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Daniel McDonald | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Chris Noble | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Cook | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Marshall | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ATKIN | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £568.83k | £416.62k | £615.63k | £512.21k | £734.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £461.89k | £309.51k | £520.29k | £620.79k | £775.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £520.57k | N/A | £580.15k | £453.66k | £652.63k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £47.38k | N/A | £35.44k | £58.30k | £78.89k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £875 | N/A | £43 | £244 | £2.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £100.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £379.26k | N/A | £451.17k | £504.30k | £643.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £82.63k | N/A | £69.12k | £116.49k | £132.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.01k | N/A | £19.16k | £21.18k | £23.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.95k | N/A | £352.85k | £408.90k | £396.43k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £746.18k | N/A | £592.13k | £501.64k | £453.54k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £47.48k | N/A | £30.87k | £105.01k | £85.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO FAMILIES AND PARTNERS OF POLICE OFFICERS AND POLICE STAFF WHO HAVE LOST THEIR LIVES IN CONNECTION WITH POLICE DUTY, BY OFFERING PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL ASSISTANCE TO COPE WITH THE TRAUMA OF SUCH A DEATH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victoria House
Cygnet Drive
Tamworth
Staffordshire
B79 7RU
- Phone:
- 01543410790
- Email:
- admin@ukcops.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window