SNAPS Yorkshire CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of therapeutic support via hydrotherapy, rebound therapy and swimming for children with additional needs, aged between 1 and 16, along with fun and educational activities, and including the whole family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- SNAPS (YORKSHIRE) (Working name)
- SPECIAL NEEDS & PARENT SUPPORT (YORKSHIRE) CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN EATWELL | Chair | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Gamba | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Serina Dale | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY JOHN LIMB | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Victoria Naylor | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Marie Sheridan | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS BALDWIN WAKE | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sunjayee Ravindra Chauhan | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Rowson | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Harris | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lora Jane Bedford | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Hingerton | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.86k | £211.12k | £174.35k | £184.32k | £415.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.76k | £111.60k | £173.61k | £260.29k | £289.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2017 as amended on 11 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
1) TO HELP MEET THE NEEDS OF PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY, ADVICE AND INFORMATION. 2) TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS. 3) TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS SO THAT CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17A Earlswood Avenue
LEEDS
LS8 2AF
- Phone:
- 07813028594
- Email:
- chriseatwell@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window