TIVERTON UNITED CHURCH (METHODIST AND URC)

Charity number: 1174508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian Faith in the area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £126,669
Total expenditure: £96,057

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 September 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nicholas Lakin Chair 25 July 2022
TIVERTON & WELLINGTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Clive Martin Williams Trustee 26 September 2021
Churches Housing Action Team (Devon) Ltd
Received: On time
Wendy Elizabeth Walker Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Allington Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Piers Buchanan Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Judith Williams Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Angela Arendina Wall Trustee 15 November 2018
None on record
JOYCE MAY BLACKWELL Trustee 10 September 2017
TIVERTON & WELLINGTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
GORDON LEACH CLATWORTHY Trustee 10 September 2017
None on record
SANDRA MAY RICHARDSON Trustee 06 September 2015
None on record
RICHARD JOHN ALLINGTON Trustee 06 September 2015
None on record
SARAH JANE DUMMETT Trustee 06 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £53.46k £47.16k £90.39k £90.15k £126.67k
Total expenditure £39.09k £42.97k £109.20k £98.65k £96.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tiverton United Church
St. Peter Street
TIVERTON
Devon
EX16 6NU
Phone:
07895 740286