Trustees BETLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 510948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD HEAD Chair 24 September 2012
None on record
Simon King Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
Jemima Jones Trustee 11 November 2021
FRIENDS OF BETLEY SCHOOL
Received: On time
Peter Ainsworth Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Lee Spragg Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Patricia Gee Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Kevin Locke Trustee 11 December 2019
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HEALTH & SAFETY GROUP
Received: On time
Rebecca Annette Fletcher Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Charlotte Louisa Daly Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Anthony Turner Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Chris Woods Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
JUDITH BETTLEY-SMITH Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
BERNARD SWIFT Trustee 24 September 2012
None on record
CHRISTINE HAWKESLEY Trustee 24 September 2012
None on record
DIANA WOODS Trustee 24 September 2012
None on record
MRS M JOHNSTON Trustee
None on record
EVELINE A BISHOP Trustee
None on record