HILLSIDE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
O PROMOTE :- CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH, ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT,CIRCUIT,LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH OR ANY SOCIETY, INSTITUTION OR CHARITY BEING A SOCIETY, INSTITUTION OR CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £2,666 from 5 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 November 2017: Standard registration
- BRINSCALL METHODIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Francis Scott | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Anne Elizabeth Krige | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Colling | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul James Barron | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Karen Amanda Hilsden | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Katherine Eleanor Klunder | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MR CHRIS HOWARD | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Mark Mackley | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WALLIS | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BERYL FRANKISH | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||
NORMA KLUNDER | Trustee | 01 October 1995 |
|
|||||||
MR TIM MELLING | Trustee | 01 October 1995 |
|
|||||||
ANGELA MELLING | Trustee | 01 October 1995 |
|
|
||||||
JANET HORTON BSC-HON | Trustee | 15 March 1984 |
|
|||||||
MR GEOFF HORTON | Trustee | 23 June 1983 |
|
|
||||||
DUNCAN FROST | Trustee | 19 March 1982 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.00k | £86.05k | £90.92k | £84.17k | £98.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.01k | £80.56k | £71.19k | £67.36k | £82.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £525 | £2.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF Û (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillside
School Lane
Brinscall
CHORLEY
PR6 8PU
- Phone:
- 01254831667
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window