THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and pastoral activities supporting the parishioners and visitors to Bures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 07 June 2019: Standard registration
- 05 March 2020: Funds received from 241726 MRS DORCAS BRIDGES
- ST MARY'S BURES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Whittle | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Clifft | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Barnham | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Lindsey-Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Horton | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wright | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel Raymond Whiffin | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Manning | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Boyce | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles John Whittle | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Penelope Elder | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA DAWN CARTER | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MURRAY CHARLES EMERSON | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID CLIFFT | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ALEXANDRA MARY TOMKINSON | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EVELENE RYMAN | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE CATHERINE SCOTT | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WOLSTEN-CROFT | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|||||
ALAN RYMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.00k | £98.24k | £98.91k | £110.95k | £155.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.00k | £99.60k | £101.30k | £115.66k | £104.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 December 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 December 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
CHURCH SQUARE
BURES
CO8 5AA
- Phone:
- 01787228292
- Email:
- vicar@parishchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window