COGGESHALL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to advance the education of young people in the Coggeshall and surrounding area by the provision of a Youth Worker to undertake youth work in local schools, local churches and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 27 September 2018: CIO registration
- 27 November 2023: Funds received from 1180726 ARTSPACE COGGESHALL
- CYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES DAVID KEMPSTER BARDRICK | Chair | 11 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Alexander Wickens | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Armour | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jackson | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR MATTHEW WILLIAM LYNN | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Bigg | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARNABY CHRISTIAN ANTONY STINTON | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN COGGESHALL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS SO AS TO ENABLE THEM THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF A YOUTH WORKER TO UNDERTAKE CHRISTIAN YOUTH WORK IN LOCAL SCHOOLS, LOCAL CHURCHES, AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Church Green
Coggeshall
Colchester
CO6 1UT
- Phone:
- 01376562736
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window