THE WANDERING MINSTRELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wandering Minstrels delivers musical/theatrical performances that entirely focus on the Arts and exclusively focus on the works of Gilbert & Sullivan. The performances take place in a full range of venues around the UK and are open to all members of the public. The Director and Musical Director have huge expertise in the works of Gilbert and Sullivan and are widely recognised in their fields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 May 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM HURST BROWN | Chair | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH LANG | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Rawlinson | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne McDonald | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £684 | £0 | £5.10k | £5.60k | £5.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £520 | £48 | £4.60k | £5.65k | £5.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2022 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC WORKS OF GILBERT AND SULLIVAN BY THE GIVING OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 ROBBERY BOTTOM LANE
WELWYN
AL6 0UL
- Phone:
- 07971195126
- Email:
- hannah@hannahlang.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window