CATHOLIC CARE (DIOCESE OF LEEDS)

Charity number: 513063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For over 150 years Catholic Care has been providing flexible solutions to social challenges across Yorkshire. We deliver a wide range of services including residential and supporting living for adults with learning disabilities and mental health issues, a residential care home for children, social work and children's mental health services, and a variety of community services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CATHOLIC CHILD WELFARE SOCIETY (DIOCESES OF LEEDS AND HALLAM) (Previous name)
  • CATHOLIC SOCIAL WELFARE SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF LEEDS AND HALLAM) (Previous name)
  • CATHOLIC SOCIAL WELFARE SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF LEEDS) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Right Reverend Marcus Stock Chair 13 November 2014
LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE
Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
Robert James Kilcoyne Trustee 17 September 2024
CENTRAL YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Ian Bannister Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Julie Frances Jones Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Rev Martin Edward Kelly Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Kevin Joseph John Devers Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
MAUREEN FLETCHER Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record
Rev. Dr. Joseph Domenic Cortis Trustee 01 December 2015
LEEDS FAITHS FORUM
Received: On time
LEEDS CHURCH INSTITUTE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Susan Mary Christine Rix Trustee 25 November 2014
MENSTON MEMORIAL COTTAGE CHARITY
Received: On time
MONSIGNOR DONAL LUCEY Trustee
HOUSE OF LIGHT TRUST (LEEDS) LIMITED
Received: On time
Timothy Parr Trustee
THE INVIGORATE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.15m £3.95m £4.24m £5.57m £5.82m
Total expenditure £4.06m £4.24m £4.98m £6.00m £6.36m
Income from government contracts £2.99m £2.83m £2.96m £3.80m £4.24m
Income from government grants £896 £79.51k £39.71k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £209.66k £147.45k £171.51k £146.53k £169.56k
Income - Other trading activities £1.44k £2.67k £2.00k £292 £832
Income - Charitable activities £3.85m £3.72m £3.96m £5.03m £5.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £90.56k £87.00k £109.59k £83.97k £80.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £305.04k £0
Income - Legacies £110.36k £18.05k £50.84k £6.22k £21.58k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.96m £4.14m £4.84m £5.95m £6.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £103.07k £101.33k £136.25k £52.57k £54.34k
Expenditure - Governance £115.25k £124.04k £176.38k £131.31k £160.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £23.69k £23.88k £20.56k £10.10k £11.44k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £3.75m £2.74m £4.62m £3.75m £3.70m
Long-term investments £3.04m £4.16m £550.27k £1.37m £973.72k
Other assets £625.73k £985.70k £2.15m £921.35k £899.95k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.29m £1.50m £1.61m £865.83k £855.70k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 NORTH GRANGE ROAD
HEADINGLEY
LEEDS
LS6 2BR
Phone:
01133885400