Good Neighbours-Rural Peterborough

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support people in need in the local community in order to improve their quality of life. This support provision includes but is not limited to befriending, transport, domestic support, and household assistance. To develop a sense of mutual support and friendship within the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,889 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 06 November 2019: CIO registration
- RURAL NORTH WEST PETERBOROUGH GOOD NEIGHBOURS SCHEME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil David Boyce | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cave | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Irene Walsh | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Halfhide | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stannage | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Biggam Bysshe | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Skingle | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOAN PICKETT | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MANTON BAXTER | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Lucas | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.56k | £30.59k | £36.82k | £99.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.26k | £22.97k | £35.74k | £73.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.56k | £20.93k | £26.54k | £1.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Nov 2019 as amended on 23 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE POOR, SICK, ELDERLY OR DISABLED RESIDENTS OF THE RURAL NORTH WEST PETERBOROUGH AREA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES AS TRANSPORT, HOME VISITING, HOME ASSISTANCE, BE-FRIENDING AND OTHER SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BENAMS CLOSE
CASTOR
PETERBOROUGH
PE5 7AW
- Phone:
- 07460 817022
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window