TEACH US TOO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working towards a world where all children are taught to read and write regardless of their educational label through challenging attitudes and assumptions based on labels, influencing educational practice, encouraging ambition and sharing good practice for practitioners and parents alike.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 July 2019: Standard registration
- 24 March 2021: Funds received from 1177998 TEACH US TOO CHARITABLE TRUST 2
- TEACH US TOO (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chantal Bryan | Chair | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ellise Hayward | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Collis | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GILES | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable Christopher Bryan | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.19k | £3.23k | £2.57k | £5.67k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £445 | £145 | £10.53k | £9.68k | £10.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM PROFOUND AND MULTIPLE LEARNING DISABILITIES (PMLD) WHO ARE EDUCATIONALLY AND SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR PMLD BY ANY METHOD WHICH SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY: (A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE PARENTS OF THOSE CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM PMLD TO MAXIMISE THE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR CHILDREN; (B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING THE PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM PMLD, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION; (C) GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; (D) COUNSELLING OR OTHER PRACTICAL ADVICE; AND (E) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Rectory Close
Stanton St. Quintin
Chippenham
SN14 6DT
- Phone:
- 07880927468
- Email:
- info@teachustoo.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window