HEADSPACE

Charity Number: 1189822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion and protection of good mental health of young people in Gloucestershire and the surrounding areas, in particular but not exclusively through the provision of counselling programmes, signposting and support services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £26,793
Total expenditure: £50,449

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATHRYN HELEN PULHAM Chair 08 June 2020
None on record
Nikita Smith Trustee 09 April 2025
None on record
John ap Robert Jones Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Julie Daphne Mitchell Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Kevan Taylor Trustee 08 June 2020
GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Sportily
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £152.45k £66.28k £45.09k £26.79k
Total expenditure £18.35k £30.13k £29.60k £50.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k £5.00k £6.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 6
Old Station Yard
Bourton Industrial Estate
Bourton on the Water
Cheltenham
Phone:
01451822629