SETTLE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit: organises worship in each Church through the Preaching Plan. trains local preachers to spread the Gospel of Jesus pays ministers to serve their communities and witness to the Gospel. provides administrative support to its churches and offers a source of initiative and decision making through the Circuit Leadership Team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

30 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 April 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy Charles Broughton | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Irene Elizabeth Whitfield | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Lucy Jane Atkinson | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Kay Lund | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Pittendreigh Edwards | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Park | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Averil Belinda Bayes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Duncan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margery Dowling | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Judith Marshall | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Meikle | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Wigfield | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Perris | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Lister | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Proctor | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Dorothy Dawson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Park | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Park | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Jane Mansergh | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Whitfield Lawson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Anthony Blacow | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Robert Taylor | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Pike | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Blacow | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Allinson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Park | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonny Lawson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lawson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY VIVIENNE HOLT | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.10k | £109.07k | £90.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.37k | £121.36k | £132.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Ingfield Lane
SETTLE
North Yorkshire
BD24 9BA
- Phone:
- 07518 517 901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window