CANARY WHARF MULTIFAITH CHAPLAINCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a chaplaincy the annual objectives are to provide a multi-faith chaplaincy service to all those in the Canary Wharf estate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 16 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Charles Bouverie Home | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Carolanne Minashi | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Lacey | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Johnstone Venner | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Matthew Hammerstein | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Victoria Zandstra | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.93k | £129.07k | £131.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.31k | £98.28k | £113.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCING RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING A MULTIFAITH CHAPLAINCY SERVICE TO ALL OF THOSE IN THE CANARY WHARF ESTATE (THE "ESTATE"), INCLUDING APPROPRIATE WORSHIP AND PASTORAL CARE FOR THOSE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE AND LENDING EMOTIONAL, SPIRITUAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED; AND (2) PROMOTING RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY TEACHING PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE TO APPRECIATE EACH OTHER'S DISTINCTIVE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND, AND TO THIS END ALSO ENCOURAGING FRIENDSHIP, GOODWILL AND UNDERSTANDING AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONE CANADA SQUARE
CANARY WHARF
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02074771073
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window