HASLEMERE FOOD BANK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Food Bank is to support families and individuals in need in and around the Haslemere area by providing emergency food and household supplies. Other means of support are also provided and advice given by signposting families and individuals to other relevant information and advisory services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £32,201 from 2 government contract(s) and £32,201 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 February 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Mackay | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Mee | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bowring | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Rice | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rice | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Aileen Margaret Assender | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SUGDEN | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Boreham | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.02k | £48.50k | £73.88k | £82.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.51k | £41.31k | £60.21k | £57.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.50k | £15.75k | £18.36k | £32.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN HASLEMERE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
HASLEMERE METHODIST CHURCH
LION GREEN
HASLEMERE
GU27 1LD
- Phone:
- 07818692389
- Email:
- haslemerefoodbank@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window