MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One of the main function of the MRIKPA is to communicate with the membership through MRIKPA Newsletter/Magzine. Provides help, support and advice to kidney patients through out the north west region. Help through Amenity fund managed by social services MRI. Buy needed equipment for hospital where it is requested and can not be funded by the trust. Hardship cases considered anyway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 11 November 1985: Standard registration
- NORTH WEST REGION KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY HILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Coyle | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Cassandra Brzoza | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET RICHARDSON | Trustee | 22 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIKE KEWLEY | Trustee | 22 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
WAJID IQBAL | Trustee |
|
||||||
ARIJIT SEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.57k | £14.97k | £2.47k | £1.59k | £23.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.16k | £3.91k | £2.98k | £6.78k | £9.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUNE 1985. AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 1995 AND 11 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 16TH MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, THROUGH-OUT THE NORTH WEST REGION OF ENGLAND, THE WELFARE OF PERSONS RECEIVING TREATMENT FOR DISEASE OR ILLNESS AFFECTING THE KIDNEYS AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, COUNSELLING AND ADVICE TO THEIR RELATIVES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST REGION OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Carrington Lane
Sale
M33 5ND
- Phone:
- 01619692524
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window