MAXIMUS FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1198262
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Maximus Foundation is committed to helping people in need. The focus is to support charities that help disadvantaged people and make a real difference to people's lives; through health, employment or community development. The Maximus Foundation supports charities by providing them with meaningful grants, which enables the organisation's to drive forward their core mission and purpose.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 2022: CIO registration
  • 01 August 2024: Funds received from 1160326 MAXIMUS FOUNDATION UK
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charis Green Chair 16 March 2022
None on record
Ferdinand Morales Jr Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Roger Kenneth Peace Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Patrick McGeough Trustee 24 May 2023
HERTS DISABILITY SPORTS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
VEHICLES FOR CHANGE
Received: On time
BRIGHTON MARINA STUDIOS
Received: On time
Lynne Sheehy Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Tracie Wilson Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 31 July 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 August 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Maximus UK
Suite B, First Floor
2 Navigation Walk
Waterfront
Wakefield
WF1 5RH
Phone:
07350356606